Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Dumais, Hubbard, Morhaim, and Simmons
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Designating specified firearms as assault weapons; prohibiting with specified exceptions a person from transporting an assault weapon into the State or possessing, selling, offering to sell, transferring, purchasing, or receiving an assault weapon; requiring the Handgun Roster Board to compile and maintain a roster of prohibited assault weapons; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0623
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2013 2/25/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2013 2/25/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-202, 4-106, 4-301 through 4-306, 4-305, 4-306 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM