Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Krimm, Lierman, Morales, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the placement of more than two children in a treatment foster care home in order to place siblings together if the local department makes a written finding that placing the siblings together is in their best interests and that the siblings will not harm other children placed at the same treatment foster care home; and requiring the local department to notify the Social Services Administration of the Department of Human Resources of the placement.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0085
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {322312/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {798877/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {322312/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {798877/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-525.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM