Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Sanchez, Cullison, Dumais, Glenn, Kelly, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, A. Miller, Moon, Proctor, Robinson, Sydnor, Tarlau, Valderrama, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Ramirez)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, for purposes of filing a petition for U Nonimmigrant Status, a victim or victim's family member to request a certifying official to certify victim helpfulness on a Form I-918, Supplement B certification; providing that, for the purpose of the Act, a victim shall be considered to be helpful, to have been helpful, or likely to be helpful to the detection, investigation, or prosecution of a qualifying criminal activity; requiring the certifying official to sign and complete the certification in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0616
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
Text - Third - Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (118-18) 51
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {108074/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 63A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-929, 11-930 )
Last Updated: 11/13/2019 12:53 PM