Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Budget - Board of Public Works - Notice of Reductions in Appropriations
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Barron, Hettleman, and Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works to provide specified public notice at least 72 hours before approving a reduction in appropriations; and requiring the Board of Public Works to provide specified written notice within a specified period of time to the Legislative Policy Committee, the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, and the House Appropriations Committee.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page