Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Wind and Solar Generating Stations - Local Zoning and Land Use
Sponsored by
Delegates Arentz, Ghrist, and Jacobs
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Public Service Commission from taking final action on an application for a certificate of public convenience and necessity for a certain wind or solar generating station until a county or municipal corporation in which any part of the generating station is proposed to be located has completed a certain review of the proposed land use and provided a certain written statement that the generating station conforms with all county or municipal zoning and land use requirements to the Commission; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0997
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Utilities - Wind and Solar Generating Stations - Local Zoning and Land Use
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM