Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Property Subject to Historic Preservation Easement - Application for Change or Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Beitzel, and McKay
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Historical Trust to notify a certain applicant of the decision of the Director of the Maryland Historical Trust on an application for the change or alteration of a property subject to a certain historic preservation easement on or before the earlier of the expiration of a certain time period specified in the easement documentation or 90 days after the date the application or any supplement to an application is submitted to the Trust; and defining "general repair and maintenance".
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0960
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274231/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {133425/1 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Historical Trust - Property Subject to Historic Preservation Easement - Application for Change or Alteration
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Historical Trust - Property Subject to Historic Preservation Easement - Application for Change or Alteration
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {274231/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Floor Amendment {133425/1 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Historical Trust - Property Subject to Historic Preservation Easement - Application for Change or Alteration
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Text - Chapter - Maryland Historical Trust - Property Subject to Historic Preservation Easement - Application for Change or Alteration
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page