Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credits - Employer Child Care Centers and Employer-Provided Child Care Services
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a credit against the State income tax, under certain circumstances, for certain taxpayers who incur certain qualified expenses for certain costs to purchase or acquire certain qualified child care property or who, during the taxable year, incur certain operational costs to provide child care services for the taxpayer's employees or to compensate certain child care providers; providing that the credit may not exceed a certain amount; allowing for the carryforward of the credit under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credits - Employer Child Care Centers and Employer-Provided Child Care Services
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-751, 10-752 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:25 PM