Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Human Relations – Employment Discrimination and Discriminatory Housing Practices – Time to File Complaint
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the time periods within which a person claiming to be aggrieved by a certain discriminatory act or housing practice is required to file a complaint with the Commission on Civil Rights; and altering the date that begins the time period within which certain complaints must be filed.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Human Relations - Employment Discrimination and Discriminatory Housing Practices - Revisions
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {116082/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Human Relations – Employment Discrimination and Discriminatory Housing Practices – Time to File Complaint
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (106-31) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1004, 20-1020, 20-1021 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:34 AM