Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Arora, Barkley, Carr, Frick, George, Luedtke, McDonough, Mizeur, Stocksdale, and Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a registered sex offender who applies for admission to a nursing home or an assisted living program to provide a specified notification to the nursing home or assisted living program during the admission process; adding to the information to be included in a registration statement; prohibiting a facility from knowingly employing an identified registrant; authorizing a facility to decline admission to an identified registrant; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-705, 11-706, 11-708 )
(   19-2401 through 19-2405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM