Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Pendergrass, McIntosh, Cullison, K. Young, Pena-Melnyk, R. Lewis, Charles, Kelly, Rosenberg, Barron, Johnson, and Hill
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from accepting any federal funding under Title X of the federal Public Health Service Act if the Title X program excludes family planning providers and does not require certain providers to provide a broad range of acceptable and effective medically approved family planning methods and services; requiring the Governor to fund the Family Planning Program with State funds at the same level of total funds as the preceding fiscal year if the Department does not accept Title X program funds; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0904
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {316082/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-38) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Floor Amendment {573827/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Floor Amendment {643620/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-28) 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (28-16) 60
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (92-40) 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3401, 13-3402 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:34 AM