Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Foreclosure Actions
Sponsored by
Delegate Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Invalidating a power of sale or assent to decree authorized in a mortgage or deed of trust on certain residential property that is executed on or after October 1, 2019; requiring an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on certain residential property to be commenced only by the owner of the debt instrument of a mortgage or deed of trust; requiring an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on certain residential property to be commenced by filing a complaint; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Foreclosure Actions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Foreclosure Actions
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105, 7-105.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM