Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Organ Donation - Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain insurers, based solely on the status of an applicant or individual status as an organ donor, from taking certain action relating to certain insurance policies; prohibiting certain insurers from prohibiting an applicant or individual from donating an organ as a condition of insurance; providing that certain employees are entitled to up to 60 business days of unpaid organ donation leave in a 12-month period under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0705
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019, January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {496689/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Text - First - Organ Donation - Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {496689/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Organ Donation - Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Finance 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Text - Chapter - Organ Donation - Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-501 )
(   3-103, 3-1401 through 3-1409 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:41 PM