Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Housing - Community Development Program Act - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, Boyce, Fraser-Hidalgo, Harrison, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, Lehman, Love, Stewart, and Wells
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Administrator of a certain abandoned property fund to distribute $5,000,000 to a certain Community Development Program Fund; altering the contents of the Community Development Program Fund to include any money distributed from a certain abandoned property fund; and repealing a certain provision providing for the construction of certain Acts of the General Assembly concerning the Community Development Program Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0632
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Housing - Community Development Program Act - Funding
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation 29
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {320916/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Housing - Community Development Program Act - Funding
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (96-40) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 48
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-317 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:34 AM