Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Facility License - Revocation of Local Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Saab
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Anne Arundel County Board of License Commissioners from revoking an alcoholic beverages license for an entertainment facility for a violation of certain nudity and sexual display restrictions if the holder of the license operates a performance area that is primarily devoted to the arts or theatrical performances and the performances express matters of serious literary, artistic, scientific, or political value; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0405
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Facility License - Revocation of Local Licenses
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-102, 11-2101, 11-2104, 4-605 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:28 PM