Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims and Victims' Representatives - Plea Agreements (The Victim Empowerment in Plea Deals Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Delegates Cox, Adams, Arentz, Arikan, Beitzel, Boteler, Buckel, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Clark, Corderman, M. Fisher, Ghrist, Grammer, Griffith, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Mangione, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland State's Attorney's Association to develop and distribute to each State's Attorney's Office in the State a certain certification form; requiring a prosecuting attorney to request that a victim or victim's representative certify that the victim or victim's representative has received a certain notice of the terms of any plea agreement; requiring a prosecuting attorney to retain a copy of the certification as part of the prosecuting attorney's case file; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victims and Victims' Representatives - Plea Agreements (The Victim Empowerment in Plea Deals Act of 2020)
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/6/2020 8:41 AM