Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurements by Maryland Department of Transportation - Accidental Death and Dismemberment Benefits Required
Sponsored by
Delegate Rudolph
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of Transportation from deeming a bidder or offeror as prequalified if the Department determines that the bidder or offeror fails to provide accidental death and dismemberment benefits for its employees; providing that a prospective bidder or offeror that is not prequalified that makes a bid or offer on a procurement by the Department may not be deemed a responsible bidder or offeror unless the bidder or offeror submits evidence to the Department, as specified.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/04/2013 3/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM