Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County Board of Education - Elected School Board Ho. Co. 11-17
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that, beginning with a specified election, specified members of the Howard County Board of Education shall reside in specified districts and specified members may reside anywhere in the county, and that the members shall be elected at large by the voters of the entire county; requiring the County Executive of Howard County to endeavor to ensure that the county board reflects characteristics of the county population, as specified; providing for the termination of the terms of specified members of the county boards; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Howard County Board of Education - Elected School Board Ho. Co. 11-17
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {335966/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Howard County Board of Education - Elected School Board Ho. Co. 11-17
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Howard County Board of Education - Elected School Board Ho. Co. 11-17
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {335966/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Howard County Board of Education - Elected School Board Ho. Co. 11-17
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 48
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Text - Chapter - Howard County Board of Education - Elected School Board Ho. Co. 11-17
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-701 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:41 PM