Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Howard County Housing Commission - Subsidiary Entities Ho. Co. 26-19
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a nonprofit entity shall be deemed controlled by the Howard County Housing Commission if the nonprofit entity is established by the Commission under certain provisions of law and the Commission has the power to appoint a majority of the board of directors of the nonprofit entity or is the sole member of the nonprofit entity; and altering the applicability of certain tax exemption provisions to include a subsidiary entity of a certain Howard County Housing Commission entity under certain circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Howard County - Howard County Housing Commission - Subsidiary Entities Ho. Co. 26-19
House 3/13/2019 3/14/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Howard County - Howard County Housing Commission - Subsidiary Entities Ho. Co. 26-19
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Referred Rules 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Text - Chapter - Howard County - Howard County Housing Commission - Subsidiary Entities Ho. Co. 26-19
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page