Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Aftermarket Parts - Warranty Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Impallaria
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an insurer that requires the use of aftermarket parts for the repair of a motor vehicle covered under a policy of motor vehicle insurance issued or delivered by the insurer to provide to the insured an express written warranty that any aftermarket parts used for the repair of the motor vehicle are merchantable; requiring the warranty to include specified coverage and have a duration of one year after the repair of the motor vehicle is completed, or the length of ownership of the motor vehicle, whichever is longer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-906.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM