Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study State Alcohol Regulation, Enforcement, Safety, and Public Health
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, W. Miller, and Lisanti
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Task Force to Study State Alcohol Regulation, Enforcement, Safety, and Public Health to examine whether the State agency that now is assigned the tasks of regulating the State alcoholic beverages industry and enforcing State alcoholic beverages laws is the most appropriate agency to ensure the safety and welfare of the residents of Maryland; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations on certain policies; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the General Assembly by December 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force to Study State Alcohol Regulation, Enforcement, Safety, and Public Health
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {353794/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Task Force to Study State Alcohol Regulation, Enforcement, Safety, and Public Health
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (128-10) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-3) 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Text - Chapter - Task Force to Study State Alcohol Regulation, Enforcement, Safety, and Public Health
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:14 PM