Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Trust
Sponsored by
Delegate Hucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program for eligible private sector employees; establishing the Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Trust and the Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Investment Board; authorizing the Board to implement, maintain, and administer the Program and the Trust; requiring eligible employers to offer the Program and requiring eligible employees to participate in the Program unless written notice to opt out is provided to the employer; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101 through 12-701 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM