Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Competitive Sealed Proposals - Construction Contracts - Economic Inclusion Plans
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Carter, Oaks, and Tarrant
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified universities to follow specified provisions of law regarding procurements for construction contracts; authorizing the use of competitive sealed proposals for procurements for construction; requiring specified procurements to comply with specified provisions of law regarding competitive sealed proposals; requiring specified offerors and contractors to make a specified effort to comply with provisions of law regarding minority business enterprise; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-203, 13-104, 13-501 through 13-508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM