Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Arikan, Chisholm, Corderman, Griffith, Impallaria, McComas, McKay, Reilly, Szeliga, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is convicted of first-degree murder may be sentenced to death under certain circumstances; providing that a certain mass murder under certain circumstances constitutes an aggravating circumstance that the court or jury must consider in making a determination as to the imposition of the death penalty; establishing procedures for the imposition of the death penalty; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act)
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101,   2-201,   2-202, 2-301, 2-303, 2-304,   2-305,   2-401 )
Last Updated: 3/3/2020 4:11 PM