Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Calculation of Maryland Taxable Income - Itemized Deductions
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Turner, Luedtke, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain taxpayers to increase the amount of itemized deductions used to determine Maryland taxable income by a certain amount of real or personal property taxes paid by the taxpayer and by the amount of certain interest paid by the taxpayer on certain home equity indebtedness and certain expenses and losses disallowed as a deduction under certain federal income tax provisions; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Calculation of Maryland Taxable Income - Itemized Deductions
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM