Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement, Maryland Judiciary Case Search, and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Acevero, Anderson, D. Barnes, Carr, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, W. Fisher, Harrison, Haynes, J. Lewis, Lierman, Moon, Smith, Turner, Washington, Wilkins, and Conaway
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for a partial expungement of certain criminal records under certain circumstances; establishing procedures for the filing of a petition for partial expungement; authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of certain records if the person is convicted of fourth degree burglary; making the Act subject to a certain contingency; requiring the State Court Administrator to issue a certain status report under certain circumstances at a certain frequency; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0589
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0220 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {582716/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {582716/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-34)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {188073/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-31)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {582716/1 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {582716/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (98-34) 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {188073/1 Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (100-31) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement, Maryland Judiciary Case Search, and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/24/2020 8:06 AM