Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Strategic Reentry Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Acevero, Chang, Corderman, Jackson, and McKay
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Juvenile Services to establish the Juvenile Strategic Reentry Program for children committed to the custody or under the guardianship of the Department of Juvenile Services; establishing the purpose of the Program; requiring the Department to direct reentry specialists to oversee the return of certain children to the community; requiring that a reentry specialist meet with a child at least 45 days before the release of the child from an out-of-home placement; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Strategic Reentry Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744460/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Strategic Reentry Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Strategic Reentry Program
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {744460/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Strategic Reentry Program
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page