Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program - Expansion and Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Chang, Corderman, Jackson, and McKay
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the scope of the Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program to include a juvenile services education program in Baltimore City beginning in the 2020-2021 school year; requiring that a certain workgroup convened by the State Department of Education to analyze the results of the Program make concluding findings and recommendations on or before December 1, 2020; and extending the termination date for the workgroup to June 30, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program - Expansion and Alterations
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-308 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM