Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker and Rose
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a jury commissioner to provide prospective juror information concerning individuals who are not citizens of the United States to the State Board of Elections within 5 days after receiving the information; requiring the State Administrator of Elections to make specified arrangements to receive the information; requiring the State Administrator to retain a list of individuals whose information has been submitted; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0842
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Text - First - Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-504 )
Last Updated: 11/13/2019 12:53 PM