Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to Consumers
Sponsored by
Delegates Howard, Hixson, Branch, Clagett, DeBoy, Guzzone, Holmes, Ivey, Olszewski, Summers, Vaughn, Walker, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a direct tobacco shipper's permit to be issued by the Office of the Comptroller; requiring a person to obtain a direct tobacco shipper's permit before the person may engage in selling and shipping pipe tobacco or premium cigars directly to a consumer in the State; requiring an applicant to submit an application and pay a specified fee; specifying the term of a direct tobacco shipper's permit; requiring a direct tobacco shipper to perform specified actions; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0823
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16.7-101 through 16.7-115 )
(   12-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM