Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsored by
Delegates Howard, Buckel, Cox, Hornberger, Krebs, McComas, Reilly, and Saab
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a limitation on claiming the income tax credit for eligible long-term care insurance premiums for more than 1 year with respect to the same insured individual; altering the amount of the credit from a one-time $500 credit to a maximum of $250 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2020, but before January 1, 2023, and a maximum of $500 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2022; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0786
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0836 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-718 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:31 PM