Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Grounds for Divorce - 12-Month Separation - Oral Amendment to Application for Divorce
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan and Dumais
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 782
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that the "filing of the application for divorce", for purposes of a provision of law authorizing a court to decree an absolute divorce on the grounds of a 12-month separation when the parties have met certain conditions before the filing of the application for divorce, includes an oral amendment made by a party with the consent of the other party at a hearing on the merits in open court to a previously filed application for limited or absolute divorce.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {912216/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-8)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {218170/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Dumais, Malone and Atterbeary)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Dumais, Malone and Atterbeary)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Motion Recede (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Committee Amendment {218170/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 782
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Grounds for Divorce - 12-Month Separation - Oral Amendment to Application for Divorce
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {912216/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Grounds for Divorce - 12-Month Separation - Oral Amendment to Application for Divorce
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (127-8) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {218170/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Dumais, Malone and Atterbeary) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Dumais, Malone and Atterbeary) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Motion Recede (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Committee Amendment {218170/1 Withdrawn 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Recede 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Recede 68
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 782
Text - Chapter - Grounds for Divorce - 12-Month Separation - Oral Amendment to Application for Divorce
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM