Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey and Stein
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a law enforcement agency and State or local volunteer fire company, rescue squad, fire department, and ambulance service to place a move over safety monitoring system on an emergency vehicle for the purpose of recording a motor vehicle committing a violation relating to the operation of a motor vehicle on approach of an emergency vehicle; requiring a recorded image made by a move over safety monitoring system to include certain images and information; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization
House 2/22/2019 2/25/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-311, 4-401, 7-302 )
(   21-405, 21-405.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page