Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Construction Services - Stop Work Orders
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to issue a certain stop work order requiring the cessation of all business operations to certain employers for certain violations of certain wage and hour laws or workplace fraud laws; providing that a certain stop work order takes effect when served and remains in effect until the Commissioner issues an order releasing a certain stop work order; requiring the Commissioner to issue an order releasing a certain stop work order on a certain showing by an employer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0688
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Construction Services - Stop Work Orders
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:32 PM