Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Relations - Natural Gas Infrastructure - Notice of Work
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger and R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a natural gas company to provide prior notice of certain work on natural gas infrastructure by advertisement in a newspaper of general circulation, on two types of social media, and on the gas company's website; and requiring a natural gas company to maintain a record of certain notice.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Relations - Natural Gas Infrastructure - Notice of Work
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Consumer Relations - Natural Gas Infrastructure - Notice of Work
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page