Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Municipal Electric Utilities
Sponsored by
Delegate Mautz
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Setting the renewable energy portfolio standard for municipal electric utilities for 2020 and later.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0677
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Municipal Electric Utilities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Municipal Electric Utilities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-27)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Municipal Electric Utilities
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Municipal Electric Utilities
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (108-27) 46
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Finance 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:32 PM