Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Disparity Grants - Amounts
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderton, B. Barnes, Sample-Hughes, and A. Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 738
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of disparity grants to specified counties and Baltimore City under specified circumstances in fiscal years 2018 and 2019.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-13)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {929739/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-12)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 738
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed (122-13) 62
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 61
Senate 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments {929739/2 Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (126-12) 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Passed Enrolled 72
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 738
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM