Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Theft-Related Crimes - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Conaway, Vallario, Anderson, Cluster, Dumais, Dwyer, Glass, Hough, K. Kelly, McDermott, Mitchell, Rosenberg, and Simmons
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Altering penalties for a conviction of extortion, malicious destruction of property, obtaining property or services by bad check, credit card fraud, identity fraud, State health plan fraud, and exploitation of a vulnerable adult involving a value at or over $1,000; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed 52
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 53A
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Second Reading Passed 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-803 )
(   3-404, 3-701, 3-702, 6-301, 8-106, 8-206, 8-207, 8-209, 8-301, 8-516, 8-801 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM