Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement Act
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, Chang, Cullison, Ebersole, Frick, Frush, Glenn, Haynes, Hill, Hixson, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Krimm, Lam, Luedtke, McCray, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Turner, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, Patterson, Tarlau, and M. Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Public School Opportunities Enhancement Program; providing that the purpose of the Program is to provide grants to local school systems, community schools, and nonprofit organizations in the State to assist in expanding or creating extended day and summer enhancement programs and to expand and support educational programs during the school day for specified organizations; requiring the Governor, for fiscal years 2018 through 2021, to include $7,500,000 annually in the State budget for the program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1125
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {895064/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-46)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {429531/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {429531/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-42)
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {895064/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (90-46) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {429531/1 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {429531/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (93-42) 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Passed Enrolled 58A
Post Passage 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-1701 through 7-1706 )
(   8-1101 through 8-1107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM