Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Next Generation Scholars of Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, A. Washington, McCray, McKay, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Cullison, Ebersole, Frick, Frush, Glenn, Haynes, Hill, Hixson, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Lafferty, Lam, Luedtke, Morhaim, B. Robinson, Valentino-Smith, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the criteria for the prequalification of a student for the Guaranteed Access Grant; changing the name of the College Readiness Outreach Program to be the Next Generation Scholars of Maryland Program; providing that the purpose of the Program is to provide guidance and services to specified students who qualify for a Guaranteed Access Grant; requiring the Governor to provide $5,000,000 in general funds in the State budget for fiscal years 2018 through 2023 for the Program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1170
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {105962/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) {193721/1 Rejected (46-88)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-44)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {104036/2
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {104036/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-11)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-46)
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {105962/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 47
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) {193721/1 Rejected (46-88) 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (88-44) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 3/26/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {104036/2 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {104036/2 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-11) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (88-46) 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Passed Enrolled 58A
Post Passage 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-303, 18-303.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM