Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Authorizing, altering, or requiring the distribution of certain revenue; specifying that the requirement to waive a certain fee for the filing of certain documents by certain business entities shall begin in fiscal year 2022; altering the cap for fiscal year 2020 from 0.5% to 0.225% on a certain adjustment to a revenue estimate relating to nonwithholding income tax revenues; requiring the budget books to include supporting data and the results of certain calculations used to calculate certain State education aid; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1040
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Reprint - House - Committee Reprint - Appropriations
Report - House - Committee Report - Appropriations
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/13 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 43A
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {974167/1 43A
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Favorable with Amendments {974167/1 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Committee Amendment (#1-4) Adopted 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Committee Amendment (#5-7) Adopted 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (106-31) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Reprint - Senate - Committee Reprint - Budget and Taxation
Report - Senate - Committee Report - Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments {839435/1 48
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {839435/1 49
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator King) Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {839435/1 50
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Committee Amendment (#1-5) Adopted 50
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Committee Amendment (#6-11) Adopted 50
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 50
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Floor Amendment {193929/1 (Senator Jennings) Withdrawn 50
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 52
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 52
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates McIntosh, Gaines, Jones, B. Barnes and Beitzel) 52
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 House advisors: (Delegates Haynes, Reznik and Korman) 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates McIntosh, Gaines, Jones, B. Barnes and Beitzel) 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 House advisors: (Delegates Haynes, Reznik and Korman) 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Senate Refuses Recede 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators King, Ferguson, Guzzone, Peters and Edwards) 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Senate advisors: (Senators Griffith, Zucker and Serafini) 52
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Senate Refuses Recede 53
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators King, Ferguson, Guzzone, Peters and Edwards) 53
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Senate advisors: (Senators Griffith, Zucker and Serafini) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Conference Committee Report {673328/1 Adopted 53A
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (103-31) 53A
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Conference Committee Report {673328/1 Adopted 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019
Post Passage 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Text - Chapter - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-117.1 )
(   10-301, 10-314 )
(   3A-309, 6-104, 7-115, 7-120, 7-329, 7-330 )
(   9-1A-31, 9-1A-37 )
(   2-103.1, 3-216 )
(   2011, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM