Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - New Residential Property - Information on Renewable Energy Alternatives
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Barve, Beidle, Carr, Kelly, Kramer, Lam, S. Robinson, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, in a contract for the initial sale of a new home, the builder provide the purchaser with specified information about energy-saving alternatives for the home, including green roofing, solar photovoltaic panels or solar/thermal devices, rain gardens and bayscaping, home weatherization, and energy storage systems; requiring the information to cover specified topics; providing a certain penalty; and requiring that the builder facilitate the installation of any energy-saving alternative that the purchaser selects.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2016 3/14/2016 Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM