Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
Sponsored by
Delegates Hornberger and Buckel
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "proceeds" to allow a video lottery operator, under certain circumstances, to reduce the amount of proceeds received from video lottery terminals and table games by the amount of certain uncollectible negotiable instruments for up to 7 days following a certain determination; requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to adopt certain regulations; requiring the video lottery operator to provide a quarterly report to certain committees regarding certain uncollectible or forgiven debts; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {625161/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-21)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
53A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {625161/1 Adopted 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (113-21) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 53A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:36 AM