Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rail Safety Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Barkley, and Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the fee imposed on a barrel of petroleum transferred in the State; establishing the Rail Safety Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund not subject to specified provisions of law; providing for the administration and use of the Fund; requiring a railroad operator in the State to file a specified oil spill response plan and certification of financial liability with the Department of the Environment; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Date Posted Document Name
2/15/2016 Text - First - Rail Safety Act of 2016
(   4-411 )
(   7-904, 7-905 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page