Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Licensed Home Inspectors - Home Inspection Reports - Presence of Yellow Corrugated Stainless Steel Tubing
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring licensed home inspectors to include in a home inspection report specified information and a specified disclosure relating to the presence of flexible gas piping composed of yellow corrugated stainless steel tubing (CSST) observed during a home inspection.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM