Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Individualized Counseling Services - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Angel
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing school-based personnel to refer a student to a school guidance counselor or a specified counseling program to determine whether the student needs specified counseling services; requiring a school guidance counselor or a specified counseling program to assist a specified student in obtaining a specified determination; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-438 )
(   15-102.3 )
(   15-716 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM