Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation - Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor Vehicle
Sponsored by
Delegates Vallario, Conaway, J. Lewis, and Sanchez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making victims of certain crimes involving the operation of a vessel or motor vehicle eligible for payment of a claim through the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0767
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Injuries Compensation - Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor Vehicle
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Criminal Injuries Compensation - Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor Vehicle
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Text - Chapter - Criminal Injuries Compensation - Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor Vehicle
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM