Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Hill, Holmes, Kelly, Lam, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Turner, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified public school safety education program to include student instruction on school vehicle safety and the use of seat belts; prohibiting specified persons from allowing pupils to stand in a school vehicle while the school vehicle is in motion; requiring that specified school vehicles purchased after January 1, 2018, be equipped with seat belts, as specified; prohibiting a person from operating a school vehicle unless the person and occupants under age 16 are restrained by a seat belt; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-410 )
(   11-153, 11-154, 11-173, 11-174, 16-113, 21-1118, 22-412, 22-412.1, 22-412.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM