Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Angel, B. Barnes, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Frush, Hayes, Kelly, Kipke, McDonough, Morgan, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, West, K. Young, Pendergrass, Hill, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Platt, and Rosenberg
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education; authorizing individuals employed by a food service facility or a recreation and wellness facility at an eligible institution to obtain, store, and administer auto-injectable epinephrine under certain circumstances; requiring an eligible institution to designate the employees who are certified to be responsible for the storage, maintenance, and control of auto-injectable epinephrine; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service Facilities at Institutions of Higher Education
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {266682/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted 44
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48A
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {277377/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-7A-01 through 13-7A-09 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:15 PM