Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Downtown Frederick Conference Center
Sponsored by
Delegates Krimm and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to review specified matters and make specified recommendations relating to the Downtown Frederick Conference Center; authorizing the Authority to acquire by specified means a Downtown Frederick Conference site or an interest in the site; requiring the Authority to submit a specified annual report, prepared in cooperation with the Office of the Comptroller and the Department of Budget and Management, to the Governor and the General Assembly; establishing a specified fund as a continuing, nonlapsing fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1038
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601, 10-613, 10-618, 10-620, 10-625, 10-628, 10-646.1, 10-658 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM