Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Assertions Made in Bad Faith - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from making in bad faith a specified assertion regarding a Web site or other electronic communication failing to comply with the federal Americans with Disabilities Act; authorizing a court to consider specified factors as evidence of whether a person has made a specified assertion in bad faith or in good faith; altering the authority of the Division of Consumer Protection of the Office of the Attorney General to take specified actions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Assertions Made in Bad Faith - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Law - Assertions Made in Bad Faith - Prohibition
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   11-1601, 11-1603.1, 11-1604, 11-1605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page